HI HB1188 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Specifies that an affidavit on application for voter registration shall be a part of the application associated with the issuance of a civil identification card and driver's license. Requires each county examiner of drivers to electronically store the contents of the affidavit on application for voter registration provided by applicants in conjunction with their driver's license and civil identification card applications and provide electronic accessibility of this information. Effective 1/1/2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating To Voting.



2017-01-30HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-24HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB246 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.


Hawaii State Sources

Bill Comments