HI SB2459 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the executive director of the office of language access to submit an annual report to the governor and legislature on compliance, complaints, resolution of complaints, and recommendations to enhance and promote language access. Appropriates funds to establish three full-time equivalent (3.0 FTE) limited English proficiency language coordinator positions in the office of language access. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Language Access.
Sponsors
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1276-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 232) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2774) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HMS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2481) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1762 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 3:30PM in conference room 329.
Subjects
Annual Report
Appropriation ($)
Limited English Proficiency Language Coordinator
Office of Language Access
Appropriation ($)
Limited English Proficiency Language Coordinator
Office of Language Access