HI HB1762 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 3:30PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 3:30PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Executive Director of the Office of Language Access to submit an annual report to the Governor and Legislature on the compliance of state agencies and certain entities with state and federal language access laws, complaints of noncompliance if any, resolution of the complaints, and recommendations on how to enhance and promote language access. Makes appropriations to fund the establishment of one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) Limited-English Proficiency Language Coordinator position in the Office of Language Access; the operating expenses of the Office of Language Access to collaborate with all state departments to ensure compliance with all state and federal language access laws; and the development by the Office of Language Access of a comprehensive statewide plan to increase language access. Effective 7/1/2060. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Language Access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-22 3:30PM in conference room 329. |
2022-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Moriwaki, Taniguchi Co-Chairs; Misalucha, Fevella. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 718). |
2022-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Tam Co-Chairs; Kapela, Ward. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 788) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3880) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HMS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 264). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 982-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 664-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2459 (Same As) 2022-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2).
Subjects
Annual Report
Appropriation ($)
Limited English Proficiency Language Coordinator
Office of Language Access
Appropriation ($)
Limited English Proficiency Language Coordinator
Office of Language Access