HI SB2457 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 619).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 619).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes time limits on administrative and judicial review decisions. Limits protests to those that are a minimum percentage of the contract value. Temporarily authorizes the governor or a county mayor to exempt a procurement from protest. Makes permanent the amendments made to section 103D-305, Hawaii Revised Statutes that increase the limits on procurements qualifying for certain small purchase procedures. Effective June 30, 2012. (SB2457 HD2)
Title
Procurement; Protest; Administrative Proceedings; Small Purchases; Electronic Procurement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 619). | |
2012-04-17 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, Choy Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Marumoto. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 452). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson, Marumoto, Rhoads, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1648-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-12 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1229-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 03-15-12 9:45AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-13-12 8:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Tuesday, 03-13-12 8:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 189) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2615) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2372) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM deferred the measure until 02-16-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-12 3:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |