HI SB2442 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-18 - (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a psychosexual evaluation to be prepared for a prisoner convicted of violation of privacy in the first or second degree prior to the prisoner's parole hearing. Authorizes the Hawaii paroling authority to consider the evaluation when considering parole for the prisoner.
Title
Parole Hearings; Violation of Privacy; Psychosexual Evaluation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee on JGO deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-10 1:15PM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to PSM/JGO. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2442&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2442_.HTM |