HI SB244 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB244

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits certain large vehicles of more than 10,000 pounds from being driven on the far left lane of any roadway having three or more lanes, with certain exceptions. Establishes a fifty-five mile per hour speed limit for trucks having a gross vehicle weight rating in excess of 10,000 pounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Statewide Traffic Code.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-30SenateRe-Referred to TRS, JDC.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB244 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to TRS, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback