HI SB2439 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pesticide buffer zones for sensitive areas beginning on July 1, 2020. Establishes penalties for violations. Requires the Department of Agriculture, based on input from the Advisory Committee on Pesticides, to adopt rules that determine amounts, distances, and wind speeds relating to pesticide buffer zones, within 18 months of the effective date.
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EDU/CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2439&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2439_.HTM |