HI SB2433 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the use of community facilities district special taxes to include educational services, including teacher salaries.
Title
Counties; Community Facilities Districts; Educational Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee on EDH deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-08 | (S) The committee on TIA deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to EDH/TIA, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2433&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2433_.HTM |