HI SB2431 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to EDU, WAM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to EDU, WAM/JDL.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for an exemption to public charter schools and their governing boards from the statutory prohibition on retaining outside counsel.
Title
Public Charter Schools; Employment of Attorneys
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM/JDL. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2062 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2431&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2431_.HTM |