HI HB2062 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for an exemption to public charter schools and their governing boards from the statutory prohibition on retaining outside counsel.
Title
Public Charter Schools; Employment of Attorneys
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2431 (Same As) 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to EDU, WAM/JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2062&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2062_.HTM |