HI SB243 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that in the event of a natural disaster, the chief election officer or county clerk in the case of county elections prior to the commencement of the election has the authority to determine whether to postpone or vote by absentee ballot in an election affected by the natural disaster. Authorizes the governor upon commencement of the election and thereafter to determine whether to postpone or vote by absentee ballot in an election affected by the natural disaster unless the governor is a candidate for office in that election. Prohibits the public disclosure of voting results for any ballot contest or question from precincts affected by an election postponement. Chief election officer may withhold election results for precincts that were not affected by the natural disaster. (SB243 HD1)
Title
Elections; Natural Disasters; Postponement; Absentee Ballots
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Woodson. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 90) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 717) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |