HI SB243 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Places the Hawaii 3Ts school technology laboratories fund under the department of business, economic development, and tourism. Repeals section 302A-1314, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism; Education; Hawaii 3Ts School Technology Laboratories Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from EDU/EGH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 120) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, English. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/EGH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU/EGH/TEC, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |