HI SB2427 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - The committee on HEA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - The committee on HEA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes members of the historic places review board to visit sites without regard to open meetings requirements.
Title
Historic Places Review Board; Site Visits
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee on HEA deferred the measure. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee on WLA deferred the measure. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-16 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HEA/WLA, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2147 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2427&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2427_.HTM |