HI SB2423 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to establish a Healthy Soils Program. Requires an annual report to the Legislature. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2412) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) DeCoite ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |