HI SB2423 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii colorectal cancer screening program to assist individuals with the detection and care of colorectal cancer. Appropriates funds for the program.
Title
Colon and Rectum Cancer Treatment; Hawaii Colorectal Cancer Screening Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2189) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2115 (Same As) 2012-02-10 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee, M. Lee excused (2).