HI SB2421 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an interagency working group consisting of the chair of the senate committee on education, chair of the house of representatives committee on education, superintendent of education, and comptroller, or their designees, and any other relevant parties. Establishes an interagency working group consisting of the chair of the senate committee on education, chair of the house of representatives committee on education, superintendent of education, and director of health, or their designees, and any other relevant parties. Tasks both interagency working groups with discussing various issues relating to Act 51, Session Laws of Hawaii 2004. Appropriates funds to the department of accounting and general services for additional positions on the islands of Maui, Hawaii, and Kauai. Appropriates funds to the department of education to establish the interagency working groups and for full-time equivalent positions. (SB2421 HD1)
Title
Department of Education; Department of Accounting and General Services; Department of Health; Interagency Working Group; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 4:20PM in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 2:00pm in Conference Room 329. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-25-14 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-21-14 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-14 2:15PM in conference room 329. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Woodson Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Fale Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 569). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1641-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1048-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-14 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Hanohano, Say, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Takai. |
2014-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 03-14-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-11 | House | Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HLT, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2715) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2165) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-14 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1746 (Same As) 2014-03-06 - Referred to EDU, WAM.