HI HB1746 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes interagency working groups to discuss and create comprehensive plans to address various issues relating to Act 51, Session Laws of Hawaii 2004. (HB1746 HD1)
Title
Department of Education; Department of Health; Interagency Working Group
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 138). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 714-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing. |
2014-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-14 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-14 at 11:00AM. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 67-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-01-29 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Awana, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, Takai. |
2014-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 01-29-14 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-17 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2421 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-25-14 at 5:20 pm in Conference Room 329.