HI SB2415 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the conveyance tax rates for residential investment properties with a value of at least $2,000,000. Exempts affordable housing qualified by the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation from the conveyance tax. (SB2415 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Conveyance Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-13 | House | Re-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 177) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2658) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |