HI SB2413 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligible business activity in the State enterprise zones to include the development or production of various types of renewable energy. (SD1)
Title
State Enterprise Zones; Renewable Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from EDT/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2298) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser, Kokubun, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-09-10 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-10 2:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to EDT/ENE, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2619 (Same As) 2010-01-27 - (H) Referred to EBM/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 7