HI SB2411 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 096, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act 096, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes references to "subsidy" in the chapters establishing standards and criteria for the award of grants to private organizations and individuals. Makes conforming amendments. (CD1)
Title
Subsidy; Deletion
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Act 096, 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197). |
2014-06-18 | House | Act 096, on 6/16/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197). |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 63-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 63-14). |
2014-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Jordan, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2014-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-23-14 2:30PM in conference room 309. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 678). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ige Chair; Kidani, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Jordan, Johanson Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 568). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Woodson excused (3). |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1509-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Woodson. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2014-02-28 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 38) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-27-14. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2473) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-05-14 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |