HI SB2403 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any report of a study or an audit enacted with a legislative appropriation or adopted by concurrent resolution to be submitted to the chairs of the appropriate subject matter committee of each house of the State Legislature. Requires a public hearing or informational briefing to be held within one year of receipt of the report, except under certain circumstances. Requires a public hearing or informational briefing to be held within one year of the publication of the performance audit reports. Exempts financial and other regularly occurring audits. Requires state departments and agencies to submit a report to the Legislature containing certain information regarding newly enacted, funded state programs within one year of the date on which the program's enabling Act became law. Takes effect 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Government Accountability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2498) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-08-24 3:03PM; CR 225. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:10PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |