HI SB2401 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to HEA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to HEA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a student in the University of Hawaii system pursuing an undergraduate degree may only be eligible for resident tuition fees for up to one hundred forty credit hours.
Title
University of Hawaii; Tuition; Residents; Limitation; Credit Hours
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1799 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2401&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2401_.HTM |