HI SB2398 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 5:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 5:00PM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the sale of tattoo supplies. Requires blood borne pathogen test as a prerequisite for tattoo licensure beginning January 1, 2013, and every two years after initial test to continue to hold a license. Prohibits tattoo trade shows under the adoption of rules by the Department of Health. Prohibits body piercing or body modifications at product demonstrations or educational demonstrations. Creates a tattoo artist task force. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2398 HD1)
Title
Tattoo Artists; Regulation; Tattoo Artist Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 5:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 1:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-12 1:00PM in conference room 312. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 752). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Green, Baker, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Herkes, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Ching. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 479). | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Deferred until 04-05-12. | |
2012-04-04 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 358). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Awana, Fontaine, M. Lee, Marumoto, Pine, Riviere, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1509-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Manahan. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Friday, 03-30-12 2:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Chang, Herkes, Nakashima excused (3). | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1178-12), recommending referral to LMG. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Carroll, Ching. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-19-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Awana voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1052-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Pine. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-13-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, LMG, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 171) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2677) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Green, Slom. | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-29-12 10:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-28-12 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-21 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from PGM/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Re-Referred to PGM/HTH, CPN. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |