HI SB2397 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary telecommuting task force to develop incentives and recommendations to encourage and expand telecommuting opportunities in the public and private sectors. (SB2397 HD1)
Title
Relating To Telecommuting.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1467-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:15AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2018-02-13 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-02-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 13) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-12-18. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from LBR/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2159) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 1:25PM in conference room 414. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR/ETT. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |