HI SB2397 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (S) Act 083, 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - (S) Act 083, 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits counties from requiring installation or retrofitting of automatic fire sprinklers in (1) new or existing one- or twofamily dwelling units used only for residential purposes; and (2) non-residential agricultural and aquacultural buildings and structures located outside the urban area; provided that this does not apply to new homes that require a variance from access road or fire fighting water supply requirements. Effective July 1, 2012. (SB2397 HD3)
Title
Counties; Automatic Fire Sprinklers; Residences
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | (S) Act 083, 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184). | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Act 083, on 4/26/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1184). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 751). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 21 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Taniguchi . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Ihara. 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Ryan, Tokuda. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Deferred until 04-16-12. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) One Day Notice 04-13-12. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-13-12. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 444). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Herkes, McKelvey, Morikawa, Wooley voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Ching, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, M. Lee, Rhoads, Souki, Takai voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1614-12) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) C. Lee; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-02-12 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1249-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) M. Lee, Luke; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Takai; and Excused: none. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Wednesday, 03-21-12 11:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on PBM with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1036-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to PBM. | |
2012-03-14 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ito, Carroll, Chang, Coffman, Har, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Pine, Thielen. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-14-12 10:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HSG, PBM, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 170) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Kidani, Nishihara, Ryan, Tokuda . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Kim). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Deferred until 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2465) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WLH. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2055) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WLH. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan. | |
2012-01-26 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM deferred the measure until 02-02-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-12 2:50PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to PGM, WLH. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |