HI SB2394 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Brower, DeCoite, Har, LoPresti, Lowen, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Takayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey, Thielen, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Brower, DeCoite, Har, LoPresti, Lowen, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Takayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey, Thielen, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires annual influenza vaccinations for health care workers. Establishes exemptions for influenza vaccination requirement under certain conditions.
Title
Health Care Workers; Influenza Vaccination
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Brower, DeCoite, Har, LoPresti, Lowen, Pouha, San Buenaventura, Takayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, Jordan, Matsumoto, McDermott, McKelvey, Thielen, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1279-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Creagan, Tupola; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan. |
2016-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 8:45AM in conference room 329. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 at 8:45am in room 329. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-21-16 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-16 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-18-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 156). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2779) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2225) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-10-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1945 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2394&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2394_.HTM |