HI SB2390 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends requirements for submission of building plans to the fire chief for approval.
Title
Fire Protection; Building Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2012-01-26 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM deferred the measure until 02-02-12 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-12 2:50PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to PGM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2390 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2390_.HTM |