HI SB2388 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure of electioneering communications to occur on the date of any subsequent expenditures for electioneering communications. Increases the monetary threshold that triggers disclosure of electioneering communications. Repeals the exception to the definition of electioneering communication those communications that constitute actual expenditures by the expending organization. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Electioneering Communications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-17 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 03-18-22 10:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 03-18-22 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-14 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-11 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 25) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-11-22. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2202) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |