HI SB2378 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-10 6:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-10 6:00PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the election of the office of Hawaiian affairs board members through a system of nonpartisan primary and general elections to begin with the 2014 elections. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2378 HD1)
Title
Office of Hawaiian Affairs; Trustees; Election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-10 6:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-10 4:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-10 3:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 65 | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Karamatsu, Carroll, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Ito, Thielen. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 496). | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 494). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Taniguchi, Co-Chair(s); Bunda, Takamine, Slom. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 353). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano, Ward excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1196-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 6:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Morita, B. Oshiro. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-18-10 2:45PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 49 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 141) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2605) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Taniguchi, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Takamine. | |
2010-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-24-10 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2122) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Bunda, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 3:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to WTL, JGO. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |