HI SB2376 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the rate of compensation and maximum allowable amounts per case for court-appointed counsel and guardian ad litem in family court proceedings. Appropriates moneys. Declares that the appropriation exceeds the state general fund expenditure ceiling for 2024-2025.
Title
Relating To Compensation For Court-appointed Representation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2193) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1913 (Same As) 2024-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:00PM in conference room 325.
Subjects
Appropriation
Court-appointed Counsel
Family Courts
Fees
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Guardian Ad Litem
Judiciary Package
Court-appointed Counsel
Family Courts
Fees
General Fund Expenditure Ceiling Exceeded ($)
Guardian Ad Litem
Judiciary Package