HI SB2365 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 231, 7/8/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1341).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 231, 7/8/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1341).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the reimbursement payments of prescription medications, including relabeled, repackaged, or compounded prescription medications, in workers' compensation claims. Requires motor vehicle insurance benefits to automatically adopt the prescription drug pricing protections associated with the workers' compensation supplemental medical fee schedule, unless otherwise modified by the Insurance Commissioner through rulemaking. (CD1)
Title
Insurance Claims; Prescription Drugs; Reimbursement Rates; Workers' Compensation; Motor Vehicle Insurance Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 231, 7/8/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1341). |
2014-07-08 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 231, 7/8/2014, (Gov. Msg. No. 1341). |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 106-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 106-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, McKelvey, Yamashita, Creagan, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:15PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, McKelvey, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Creagan, Johanson Members . |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 562). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tokioka voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Woodson. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1146-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, Har, Ito, Nakashima, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-19-14 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 953-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-03-11 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Takayama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-11-14 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 171) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2577) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-26-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2439) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL, CPN. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |