HI SB2350 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - The committee on LBR deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a family leave insurance program, which requires employees and employers to make contributions into an insurance fund to be used to provide employees with family leave insurance benefits in order to care for a designated person. Appropriates funds to implement the program.
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee on LBR deferred the measure. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2136 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2350&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2350_.HTM |