HI SB2347 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that citizen complaints against a police officer alleging acts of domestic abuse against a family or household member on the part of the police officer shall not be required to be filed as a notarized or sworn written statement. Takes effect 1/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Police Departments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2167) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-06-18 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2133 (Same As) 2018-07-06 - Act 112, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1213).