HI SB2344 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Automatically imposes a restraining order upon parties filing for annulment, divorce, or separation to preserve the financial assets of the parties and their dependents. Effective 7/1/2035. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Automatic Restraining Orders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2018-02-13 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-02-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 12) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-12-18. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2158) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1614 (Same As) 2018-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 213, 07/10/2018, (Gov. Msg. No. 1322).