HI SB2320 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacists to prescribe and dispense self-administered hormonal contraceptive supplies to patients eighteen years of age or older, regardless of a previous prescription from an authorized prescriber. Specifies requirements pharmacists must meet prior to prescribing and dispensing contraceptive supplies. Requires all insurers in the State, including health benefits plans under chapter 87A, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and medicaid managed care programs, to reimburse pharmacists who prescribe and dispense contraceptive supplies. (SB2320 HD1)
Title
Prescription Contraceptives; Contraceptive Supplies; Health Insurance; Reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC/JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Say, Souki, Tokioka excused (6). |
2016-03-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2016-03-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2016-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-11-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2016-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 46) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 4 (Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Nishihara, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2557) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, K.Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Kim, Slom. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee on JDL has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-16 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2326) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-11-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1896 (Same As) 2016-02-10 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.