HI SB2316 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends statutory limitations on the time period in which a survivor of childhood sexual abuse may file a civil suit. Permits the court to order restorative justice measures, if deemed appropriate and requested by the victim. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Childhood Sexual Abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 200) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2956) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-20 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2177 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 384).