HI HB2177 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 384).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends statutory limitations on the time period in which a survivor of childhood sexual abuse may file a civil suit. Allows punitive damages. Permits the court to order restorative justice measures, if deemed appropriate. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Childhood Sexual Abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 384).
2020-07-06HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2020-07-02HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 561) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-07-02SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-06-30Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-02-20.
2020-06-30SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2020-06-30SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3724) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-06-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-06-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 06-23-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2020-03-10SenateRe-Referred to JDC.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 184).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 894-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-25-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2).
2020-02-11HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 295-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Say.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-03-20 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2020-01-30HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-20 2:00PM.
2020-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-30-20 2:45PM in House conference room 325.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2020-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB2316 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback