HI SB231 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - The committee on THA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - The committee on THA deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii tourism authority to contract with a section 501(c)(3) private nonprofit, engaged in promoting Hawaiian culture, to develop and maintain a comprehensive Hawaiian cultural resources inventory database; appropriates funds; requires dollar-for-dollar match by the office of Hawaiian affairs.
Title
Native Hawaiian Culture Resources Inventory Database; Hawaii Tourism Authority; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee on THA deferred the measure. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to THA, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=231&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB231_.HTM |