HI SB2277 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits contractors from offering to pay or rebate, or promising to pay or rebate, an insured's property or casualty insurance deductible. Prohibits contractors from representing or negotiating, or offering or advertising to do so, on behalf of an insured in an insurance claim. Specifies violations are unfair methods of competition and unfair or deceptive acts or practices. Allows insureds to rescind contracts with the contractors within five business days after the date the contract is executed. Requires contractors to provide certain forms to an insured, prior to entering into a contract. Takes effect 7/30/2075. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Contractor Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 175) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2759) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-15-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2229) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-22 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDC. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2396 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to CPC, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Contractors
Property or Casualty Insurance
Right to Rescind
Unfair Methods of Competition
Unfair or Deceptive Acts or Practices
Property or Casualty Insurance
Right to Rescind
Unfair Methods of Competition
Unfair or Deceptive Acts or Practices