HI SB2259 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Hawaii consumers who are required to receive a summary of rights under section 609 of the federal Fair Credit Reporting Act, to also receive a notice of their rights under Hawaii law to obtain a security freeze on their credit reports. Expands the methods by which a consumer may request a security freeze. Specifies that a consumer credit reporting agency shall not charge a fee for placing, lifting, or removing a security freeze on a consumer's credit report or for placing or removing a security freeze on a protected consumer's credit report or records. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Security Freezes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2062) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Consumer Credit Reporting Agencies
Consumers
Credit Reports
Fee
Notice
Protected Consumers
Security Freezes
Consumers
Credit Reports
Fee
Notice
Protected Consumers
Security Freezes