HI SB2257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the minimum qualifications for nominees to the State Public Charter School Commission to require residency in the State. Provides that commission members may be reimbursed for necessary and reasonable travel expenses incurred in the conduct of official commission business.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 172) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3171) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-20 1:10PM in conference room 211. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2303) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-20 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1974 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.