HI SB2241 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:45AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:45AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Board of Land and Natural Resources, in declaring residential development areas and acquiring lands therein, from disturbing wetland taro lands and infrastructure on undeveloped lands. Establishes a fourth class--taro lands classification for public lands. Permits structures for loi taro fields in the agricultural district. Establishes growth and perpetuation of traditional Hawaiian crops as a goal of the State Planning Act. Authorizes BLNR, with the Taro Security and Purity Task Force, to create an inventory of taro lands. (SB2241 HD2)
Title
Agricultural Lands; Taro Land Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:45AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 9:29AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 3:20PM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 9:30AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 9:00AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 9:30AM in conference room 224. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Wooley, Evans, Onishi Co-Chairs; Brower, Kobayashi, Matsumoto Members . |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Solomon, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Kouchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-14 | House | Re-referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 55 |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 544). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Awana, Jordan, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Har, Say voting no (4) and Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1627-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Kobayashi; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson, Ward. |
2014-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-01-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-19 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-13-14 10:05AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-10 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-14 at 10:05am. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Monday, 03-10-14 10:40AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 129) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from AGL/WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Taniguchi, Slom. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Hee, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to AGL/WTL/HWN. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |