HI SB223 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB223
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Har, Ing, LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Morikawa, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Har, Ing, LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Morikawa, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a naturopathic physician to prescribe testosterone consistent with naturopathic medical practice. Clarifies that narcotic drugs shall not be included within the naturopathic formulary. (SB223 HD1)
Title
Relating To Naturopathic Medicine.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Har, Ing, LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Morikawa, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (5). |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1102) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Todd, Tupola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 102) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Green, Harimoto). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 864) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM, JDL. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB223 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Har, Ing, LoPresti, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Quinlan voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Morikawa, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (5).