HI SB2227 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for subsidies for the preschool open doors program. Makes an appropriation to create one full-time position and for costs related to administering the program. (SD1)
Title
School Readiness; Preschool Open Doors Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2070) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1786 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2