HI SB2212 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of flavored tobacco products.
Title
Tobacco; Flavored Tobacco Products
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1791 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 3
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2212&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2212_.HTM |