HI SB221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB221
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 29
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 29
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health to coordinate with each county wastewater agency to establish a low interest loan program to upgrade or convert cesspools to septic systems or aerobic treatment unit systems, or to connect cesspools to existing sewer systems or other wastewater treatment systems approved by the department. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Cesspools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 694) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH/PSM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB221 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 29