HI SB2201 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires license plates to include okinas. Authorizes the use of all uppercase letters, all lowercase letters, or initial capital letters in motor vehicle license plates. Limits special number plates for environmental conservation to apply to electric vehicles. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Number Plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2691) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1861 (Same As) 2024-06-24 - Act 064, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1165).