HI SB2198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that supplemental information received within 48 hours of a meeting of a board subject to state opening meetings law may be added to the board packet; provided that the public is promptly provided access to the supplemental information.
Title
Relating To Public Agency Meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 4:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1858 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2198&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2198_.HTM |