HI SB2194 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the felony offenses of misuse of uncrewed aircraft in the 1st, 2nd, and 3rd degrees. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Unmanned Aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2338) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-24 3:01PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1869 (Same As) 2024-07-03 - Act 161, 07/02/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262).