HI SB2189 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that failure of state and county officers and employees to carry out or comply with chapter 801D, HRS, shall provide a basis for disciplinary action, with certain exceptions. Requires competent authority to immediately report such disciplinary action to the Legislature. (SB2189 HD1)
Title
Relating To Victim Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1468-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:15AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 115) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2637) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2466) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1684 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 3